Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Susan M Benson, against Does 1-10, Nave, Jim, represented by James William Rushford, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions143 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time290 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other submitted by Nave, Jim rejected on 09/08/2011 .
Date: September 08, 2011Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: December 15, 2011Answer filed.
Date: September 14, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-03-23T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: July 21, 2011Order - Other (Stip and Order to Set Aside Default) filed.
Date: September 15, 2011Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-06-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-06-24T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-06-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to set aside default/and or default judgment) filed.
Date: September 14, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.