Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Maryland Casulaty Company, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Linda J Lynch, against Rabobank N A, Paladin Consulting Inc, Doherty Georgeson Llp, Does 1-10, Abasi, Soleiman, (total of 6) See All represented by Tamara L Lyles, John C Mccaslin, Francis X Doherty, Steven F Helfand, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions547 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time549 days |
Cross-Complaint submitted by Doherty Georgeson LLP rejected on 04/01/2011 .
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Answer submitted by Rabobank N A rejected on 04/27/2011 .
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Order - Other (Signed Dismissal) filed.
Date: August 23, 2012Opposition filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Motion submitted by Rabobank N A rejected on 12/30/2011 .
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-08-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of E K Shiu in support) filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Re: Release of Funds in Inter-Pleader Action) filed.
Date: 2012-03-06T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order re Release and Disbursement of Interpleader Funds) filed.
Date: 2012-03-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of O Clausen in support) filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-02-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2012-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-08-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Non-Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Reply filed.
Date: 2012-01-04T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-05-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/27/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-01-27T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-05-06T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Tamara L Lyles in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of L J Lynch in support) filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Reply (in support of) filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/11/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-01-11T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2011-02-23T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-02-23T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING submitted by Maryland Casulaty Company rejected on 05/17/2011 .
Date: 2011-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-05-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Proof of Deposit of Interpleader Sums) filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Letter from Adjusting Solutions Inc with reply from clerk
Date: 2011-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2011-11-15T00:00:00Motion - Other (fpr doscharge of stakeholder and award of reasonable attys fees and costs) filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Motion - Other (of pltf for restraining order pursuant to code of civil procedure secton) filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for restraining order) filed.
Date: 2012-01-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Continue the Settlement Conference and Trial of this Matter) filed.
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: 2012-01-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other filed.
Date: 2012-02-07T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 02/01/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Notice - Other (Non-Appearance) filed.
Date: 2012-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2012-04-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Non-Appearance at MSC) filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 23, 2012Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Returned Mail
Date: August 25, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.