State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Ngo, Phuong,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Ngo, Phuong
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Ngo, Phuong
Date
Type
Description
March 27, 2019
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
March 27, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
June 21, 2013
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
June 14, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
June 11, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 15, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
May 20, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
March 23, 2011
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k filed.
December 27, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .