State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Diltz, Gene E.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Diltz, Gene E.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Diltz, Gene E.
Date
Type
Description
September 30, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
December 10, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 10, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
November 18, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
April 27, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
February 24, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
September 29, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .