State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Garcia, Juan C.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Garcia, Juan C.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Garcia, Juan C.
Date
Type
Description
August 26, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 26, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
August 07, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
September 16, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
July 11, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .