State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
De La Torre, Alfredo,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. De La Torre, Alfredo
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. De La Torre, Alfredo
Date
Type
Description
August 23, 2017
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
February 06, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 11, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
January 27, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .