State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Carranza, Jeannie S.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Carranza, Jeannie S.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Carranza, Jeannie S.
Date
Type
Description
October 29, 2015
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
July 31, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
January 19, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 31, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .