State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Armijo, Rick A.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Armijo, Rick A.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Armijo, Rick A.
Date
Type
Description
July 19, 2019
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
April 11, 2018
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 16, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
July 19, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
June 20, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
October 28, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department 45 .
Judge: Judy Holzer Hersher
August 26, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .