We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department ,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department ,
against
Nazareno, Ricky E. ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
March 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Cycle Time
3327 days
Plaintiffs
State Of California, Employment Development Department
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
State Of California, Employment Development Department
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Nazareno, Ricky E.
Date
Type
Description
May 09, 2019
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Get Document
September 20, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
August 01, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
September 23, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
August 15, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
July 28, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
April 27, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
December 31, 2010
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
March 30, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
March 30, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.