State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Mejia, Julio,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Mejia, Julio
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Mejia, Julio
Date
Type
Description
February 20, 2013
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
November 06, 2012
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
December 15, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
June 15, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
March 16, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
March 30, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
March 30, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
March 30, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .