Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Campos, Alejandro, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time2118 days |
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: December 06, 2010Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: November 17, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: April 04, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 20, 2012Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: November 18, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.