State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Santos, Dagoberto,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Santos, Dagoberto
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Santos, Dagoberto
Date
Type
Description
June 25, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
June 25, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
March 05, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
September 14, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
February 23, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .