State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Marquez, Jose F.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Marquez, Jose F.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Marquez, Jose F.
Date
Type
Description
June 24, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 29, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 29, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
April 09, 2018
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
May 04, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
April 20, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
January 29, 2010
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .