Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Target National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janet L Brown, against Gutierrez, Norma R., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time259 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 03, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: March 03, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 24, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: March 03, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-21T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: August 31, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: September 15, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.