Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harvey M Moore, against Duncan, Erik J., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions118 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time286 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does submitted by Citibank South Dakota N A rejected on 09/06/2011 .
Date: September 06, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: May 11, 2011Declaration - Other (Waiver of Interest) filed.
Date: May 11, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2011-02-09T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2011-01-24T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 11, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 12, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-02-25T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: May 11, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.