Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Emily Pierce, against Does 1-25, Abbaszadeh, Hamid, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions333 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time589 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: November 28, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Correspondence--Letter from Hamid A Tarassoli dated 3/7/2011 RE: wrong person sued/served
Date: 2011-03-09T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2011-01-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2011-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 10, 2012Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed.
Date: November 28, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: November 28, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: November 28, 2011Declaration - Other (Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: November 28, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.