Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harvey M Moore, against Smith, Maurine M., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James P. Arguelles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Arguelles Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions223 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1906 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: March 18, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Lost Written Agreement) filed.
Date: August 09, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: August 09, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: August 09, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: December 30, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Interest) filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 21, 2013Writ of Execution Issued
Date: February 27, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.