Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harvey M Moore, against Parker, Diana M., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1617 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1658 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: October 09, 2013Case Management Statement filed.
Date: July 09, 2013Answer filed.
Date: February 04, 2011Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: June 03, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.