Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Does 1-10, Nevels, Daniel T., Nevels, Kristin D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Stephen P. Acquisto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen P. Acquisto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3016 days |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-07-23T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed.
Date: April 02, 2019Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2011-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Delcaration in lieu of Testimony) filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2011-10-21T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2011-10-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: January 15, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: June 24, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-07-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: September 08, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 29, 2015Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: August 12, 2016Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: April 02, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.