Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Equable Ascent Financial Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael R Boulanger, against Cornejo, Maria, Does 1-15, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time325 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 27, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 14, 2011Summons filed.
Date: December 27, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 15, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: November 17, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.