Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Equable Ascent Financial Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael R Boulanger, against Does 1-15, Lao, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1317 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 11, 2011Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: February 13, 2013Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Wavier of Interest and Attorney's Fees Declaration) filed.
Date: April 11, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration In Support Of Default Judgment CCP 585) filed.
Date: April 11, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-02-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: April 11, 2011Declaration - Other (Declaration for Reimbursement of Cost CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2011-04-11T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-04-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: December 15, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: August 05, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.