Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael R Boulanger, against Does 1 - 15, Sharma, Vinod, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1246 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1247 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 20, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 29, 2014Summons filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 15, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.