Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sepulveda Michel, Andres, Llamas, Emilio J., Cervantes, Marcos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael B Moore, against Miller, Mira Susann, M2W Inc, Does 1-100, represented by Charles S Painter, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions489 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1699 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 02, 2012Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-22T00:00:00Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.
Date: April 23, 2012Answer filed.
Date: 2011-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Liamas, Emilio J rejected on 01/03/2011 .
Date: 2011-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.
Date: 2011-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.
Date: 2012-04-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: April 24, 2012Order - Other (Amended Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account) filed.
Date: August 25, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.