Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Bjers, Michael, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions215 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time531 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 03, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: August 02, 2011Default denied as to Bjers, Michael on Complaint .
Date: March 22, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: August 02, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: July 13, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.