Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moracco, Phyllis, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dimitri T Rigopoulos, Matthew R Eason, against Does 1 To 10, Moracco, Katie Ann, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions208 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: August 26, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/06/2011 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Motion - Other (for disobedience of court's order) filed.
Date: 2011-06-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/22/2011 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2011-07-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: August 05, 2011Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-05-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of D T Rigopoulos in support) filed.
Date: 2011-06-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-06-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00Default denied as to Moracco, Katie Ann on Complaint .
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-05-06T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-07-25T00:00:00Request for Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: August 05, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: August 05, 2011Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: September 07, 2011Writ of Execution Issued
Date: September 02, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 26, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.