Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Does 1-10, Cruz, Marilou P., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time936 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: April 13, 2012Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: April 14, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 14, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 06, 2013Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-04-14T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-04-14T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 24, 2013Writ of Execution Issued
Date: August 18, 2011Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: November 15, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 18, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.