Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Anita H Singh, against Markov, Sergey, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time737 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: (Unjust Enrichment) filed.
Date: 2011-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-12-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-04-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Interest, Costs, Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2011-04-22T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-04-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: September 21, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-04-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: December 07, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 16, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.