Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harvey M Moore, against Zamora, Edwin I., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1254 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1258 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: December 01, 2010Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: May 08, 2014Answer filed.
Date: December 23, 2010Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: January 07, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: December 27, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.