Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mayorga, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by R Parker White, against Sioc, Arnulfo Tambriz, Parks, Maryann, King, Joey Kristine, Does 1-30, Dang, Jimmy Cu, (total of 6) See All represented by Richard P Bertolino, Robert L Reisinger, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerrit W. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time251 days |
Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time To Serve Pleading And Order Extending Time To Serve
Date: 2011-02-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 08, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 09, 2011Answer filed.
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-02T00:00:00Order - Other (Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders Granted) filed.
Date: 2011-05-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.