Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Swearingen, Olga, Swearingen, Mathew, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Derek C Decker, against Williams, Dewayne C., Sacramento City Unified School District, Does 1-50, Charles A Jones Skills And Business Education Center, represented by Christian Green, Domenic D Spinelli, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions621 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time744 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2012-06-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-03-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: August 13, 2012Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Opposition To Defendant Dewayne Williams' Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re:Sanctions and the filing of first Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement submitted by Swearingen, Mathew; Swearingen, Olga rejected on 12/07/2011 .
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd Amended) filed.
Date: 2012-07-02T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authoritiesin Support of Motion to Strike) filed.
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-03-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (To Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2012-06-04T00:00:00Demurrer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2012-02-08T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2011-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed.
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement submitted by Swearingen, Mathew rejected on 02/27/2012 .
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2012-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: September 27, 2012Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2012-03-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-04-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2012-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.