Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Main Street Acquisition Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Cisneros, Hector C., Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions131 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time680 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: April 11, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-02-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: April 11, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: April 11, 2011Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2011-02-02T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-04-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 11, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: September 11, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.