Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harvey M Moore, against Cripe, Daniel E., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions170 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time170 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: March 18, 2011Answer filed.
Date: October 27, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: September 29, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: October 20, 2010Summons filed.
Date: September 29, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.