Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hawarneh, Belal M., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert Masuda, against Dutra, Mary Elizabeth, Does 1 To 50, represented by Kevin J Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions253 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time274 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: June 10, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-10T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed.
Date: April 14, 2011Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: July 01, 2011Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-11-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/21/2011 03:19:00 PM .
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.