Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Solorio, Estefania, Perez, Jessica, Perez, Felix, Perez, Aureliano, Perez, Alejandro, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by W Russell Fields, against Does 1-20, Coriloni, Vincenzo, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions770 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time840 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: September 30, 2010Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 08, 2012Declaration - Other (of W. Russell Fields) filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (consent of Minor to Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem) filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Order - Other (Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem) filed.
Date: October 01, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: August 24, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.