Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lobel Financial Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ronald J Green, Jr, against Xxxxxx, Xxxxx F., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3102 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2011-03-15T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: February 28, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-11-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration Regarding Valuation of Vehicle) filed.
Date: 2010-11-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: June 30, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: June 30, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-15T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: May 14, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 08, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: September 16, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: January 30, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.