Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A A National Banking Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harlan M Reese, against Does 1-10, Garcia, Kirk K., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions176 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time478 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: September 29, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: December 23, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration in support of default judgment) filed.
Date: April 07, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-02-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Case Summary) filed.
Date: April 07, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: April 07, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: September 29, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.