Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pacific Credit Exchange, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Frank G Blundo, Jr, against Does 1-10, Bershell, Thurston, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions54 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time429 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: August 15, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Legal Assignment Of Account) filed.
Date: October 25, 2010Case Management Statement filed.
Date: January 21, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-10-25T00:00:00Returned Documents(Court Judgment)Rejected
Date: March 22, 2011Paper Exhibits filed.
Date: 2010-10-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-10-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed.
Date: April 25, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: April 25, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default submitted by Pacific Credit Exchange rejected on 11/04/2011 .
Date: November 04, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.