Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Lee, Louis G., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions371 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time379 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: August 31, 2010Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: December 03, 2010Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 06, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: August 31, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: September 14, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.