Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian N Winn, against Anderson, Blake, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions346 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1695 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: August 12, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Interest) filed.
Date: August 12, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Waiver of Amount Shown in Affidavit) filed.
Date: August 12, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Underlying Action of Account Stated) filed.
Date: August 12, 2011Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: December 16, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: April 22, 2015Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 18, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.