Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Timothy Krantz, against Ezekwo, Victor, Does 1-25, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2011 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: January 24, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: September 25, 2015Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2010-12-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Laura C. Hogan Re Lost Original) filed.
Date: January 24, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: January 24, 2011Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-01-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: March 02, 2016Writ of Execution (San Joaquin) Issued
Date: May 09, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.