Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelkris Associates, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Terry A Duree, against Boatwright, Deborah K., Curtis, Jeremy W., Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions129 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1366 days |
Declaration - Other (In Support of Entry of Judgment Under CCP 585d and CCP 1033) filed.
Date: January 07, 2011Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: July 08, 2011Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: January 07, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-01-07T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: July 08, 2011Writ of Execution (Yolo) Issued
Date: May 28, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.