Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelkris Associates Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Terry A Duree, against Boatner, Stanicia Lee, Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Ernest W. Sawtelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErnest W. Sawtelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions589 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1077 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-22T00:00:00Qualification Statement filed.
Date: October 28, 2011Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: August 12, 2013Answer filed.
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets heard on 12/17/2010 11:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-12-17T00:00:00Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: January 09, 2012Judgment on Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: April 11, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Notice on Hearing About Court Fees
Date: 2010-11-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied
Date: 2010-11-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted/Denied - Stanicia Boatner
Date: 2010-12-17T00:00:00Returned Check Notice (Sacramento) generated .
Date: 2011-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-08-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: 2011-08-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 08/19/2011 01:01:00 PM .
Date: 2011-08-19T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: October 28, 2011Miscellaneous ADR Document filed.
Date: July 18, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.