Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Potter, James, Potter, Rebecca, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Walter T Wroten, against Does 1-30, Twyman, Julie Ann, represented by Richard P Bertolino, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie M. Earl Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions714 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time750 days |
Rejection of Arbitration Award and Request for Trial De Novo filed.
Date: 2011-12-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: August 15, 2012Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-19T00:00:00Stipulation For Settlement; Order
Date: June 15, 2012Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: June 21, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-01-24T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2012-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: June 14, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.