We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Wells Fargo Bank National Association Vs. Brett R Weshner

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago ago

On September 01, 2010 a Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association, represented by Yvonne Ramirez-Browning, against Does 1-20, Weshner, Brett R., represented by in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.

Case Details

Filing Date

September 01, 2010

Last Refreshed

December 02, 2021

Filing Location

Sacramento County, CA

Judge

David I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Unlimited

Practice Area

Commercial

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Case Cycle Time

737 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

454 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Case assigned to Department 45 .

Judge: Judy Holzer Hersher

Docket Event Complaint filed.
Hearing Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP
Heard

Judge: David I. Brown

Docket Event Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/08/2011 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Judge: David I. Brown

Hearing Case Management Conference - Case Management Program
Heard

Judge: Gerrit W. Wood

Docket Event Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/12/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Judge: Gerrit W. Wood

Hearing Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion
Heard

Judge: David I. Brown

Hearing Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion
Heard

Judge: David I. Brown

Docket Event Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/20/2012 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Judge: David I. Brown

Docket Event Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP scheduled for 11/14/2011 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Judge: David I. Brown

See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.