Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jacobsen, Nathan, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Root, Michael, Martin, Todd, Does 1-20, City Of Sacramento, Benassini, Joe, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions268 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Motion to Compel - Other (plf to respond to Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Application for TRO - Writ of Mandate heard on 04/01/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Reply (to Opp) filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Opposition (Brief) filed.
Date: 2011-03-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Trial Brief filed.
Date: 2012-12-17T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed.
Date: 2011-08-10T00:00:00Order Granting Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2011-03-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Nathan Jacobsen, Trial Opening Brief) filed.
Date: 2012-12-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Katherine E. Underwood ISO Motion) filed.
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 02/01/2013 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2013-02-01T00:00:00Tentative Ruling -- Demurrer/Motion to Strike
Date: 2011-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2011-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss (for Failure to Prosecute) filed.
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for OSC re: Contempt) filed.
Date: 2011-08-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Application for TRO - Writ of Mandate heard on 03/11/2011 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2011-03-11T00:00:00Notice Of Case Assignment
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Opposition (to petition for writ of mandate) filed.
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: May 12, 2020Notice of Entry - Other (of Order Granting Prelim Injunct) filed.
Date: 2011-04-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for TRO and Preliminary Injunction) filed.
Date: 2011-03-25T00:00:00Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed.
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/13/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2011-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte Application - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 09/02/2011 11:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Dale Kooyman In Support of Preliminary Injunction) filed.
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to petition for writ of mandate) filed.
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (of Petitioner to City of Sacto Demurrer/Motion to Strike) filed.
Date: 2011-05-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 11/21/2011 03:21:00 PM .
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss (For Failure to Prosecute) filed.
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.
Date: 2011-03-02T00:00:00Declaration for Temporary Restraining Order filed.
Date: 2011-03-11T00:00:00Order After Hearing filed.
Date: 2011-03-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Joseph Benassini) filed.
Date: 2011-03-16T00:00:00Undertaking filed.
Date: 2011-03-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Nathan Jacobsen) filed.
Date: 2011-05-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Writ of Mandate heard on 05/27/2011 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-05-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Unavailability of Counsel) filed.
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-08-23T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Jacobsen v. City of Sacramento: Notice to Appear for Oral Argument (with Court's questions)
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (M Root) filed.
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of S Myers) filed.
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of J Benassini) filed.
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging filed.
Date: 2013-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2013-01-18T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Status Report) filed.
Date: 2013-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed.
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Correspondence (Re Status of preliminary injunction) filed.
Date: 2013-02-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Underwood) filed.
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 05/07/2020 11:51:00 AM .
Date: May 07, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 07, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.