Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janet L Brown, against Gary, Jennifer L., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions263 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time263 days |
Answer filed.
Date: September 20, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: April 18, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: August 26, 2010Summons filed.
Date: August 26, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: September 09, 2010Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.