Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Access Capital Services Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by E Warren Gubler, Steven A Silver, against Moore, Lori A., Moore, Joseph A., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions783 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time789 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: June 20, 2012Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 23, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-04-29T00:00:00Default denied as to Moore, Lori A on Complaint .
Date: 2010-08-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: January 13, 2011Proof of Service Misc - Non Complaint/Petition filed.
Date: 2010-06-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-08-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: October 07, 2010Default denied as to Moore, Lori A on Complaint .
Date: October 07, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: January 13, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.