Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Northern California Collection Service Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steven D Cribb, against A California Corporation, Does 1-10, Guardian Communications & Environmental Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time415 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-03-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 27, 2010Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 27, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-05-27T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-05-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-03-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-03-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: June 17, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 19, 2011Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: January 14, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: September 20, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: October 12, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.