Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fia Card Services N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Flint C Zide, against Does 1-10, Williams, Billee J., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions124 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-06-02T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 22, 2020Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 22, 2020Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-03-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration CCP 585d) filed.
Date: 2010-06-02T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-06-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-10-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (NON MILITARY STATUS) filed.
Date: August 05, 2015Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2012-05-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-10-12T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED) Issued
Date: 2010-12-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2012-10-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (WAIVER OF ACCRUING POST JUDGMENT INTEREST) filed.
Date: August 05, 2015Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: August 17, 2015Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: June 15, 2020Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.