Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Michaels, James R., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by M Nicholas Nita, against Chrysler Group Llc, Chrysler Jeep Of Elk Grove, Does 1-20, represented by Jon D Universal, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time320 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-01T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: December 07, 2010Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: September 20, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: September 15, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.